MA H3427 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3689
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-08-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3689
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-08-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3689
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the city of Methuen to lease the Oakland Avenue School building to the Islamic Academy for Peace. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the City of Methuen to lease that building known as the Oakland Avenue School to the Islamic Academy for Peace
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-25 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3689 |
2011-06-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/07/2011 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in 222 |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-04-19 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H3689 (Replaced by) 2011-09-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 107 of the Acts of 2011
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3427 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=15161&generalCourtId=1 |