MA H3427 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4530
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representative Smola of Warren, a petition of Todd M. Smola that the Registrar of Motor Vehicles be authorized to issue firefighter motorcycle license plates. Transportation.
Title
To authorize firefighter motorcycle license plates
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Smola [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4530 |
2023-09-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/02/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H4530 (Replaced by) 2024-04-29 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3427 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3427.pdf |