MA H3432 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the town of Sterling By Representatives Naughton of Clinton and Ferguson of Holden, a petition of Harold P. Naughton, Jr., Kimberly N. Ferguson and Jennifer L. Flanagan (by vote of the town) that the town of Sterling be authorized to withdraw from the career pay incentive program for police officers. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the town of Sterling
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-05 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-06-02 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2014-05-22 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-04-03 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday, June 30, 2014, pending concurrence |
2014-02-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/24/2014 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Public Service |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3432 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3432.pdf |