MA H3435 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4113
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4113
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4113
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to encourage local service delivery of Registry of Motor Vehicle services. Transportation.
Title
To improve the functioning and fairness of Registry of Motor Vehicles services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-16 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4113 |
2021-07-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/28/2021 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S2348 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3521 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3458 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2282 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - Amendment #1 () adopted
S2341 (Similar To) 2022-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2861
H4113 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S985 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2838
S2346 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2151 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H3521 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3458 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2282 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - Amendment #1 () adopted
S2341 (Similar To) 2022-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2861
H4113 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S985 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2838
S2346 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2151 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3435 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3435.pdf |