MA H3439 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4944
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4944
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4944
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the use of the Highway Fund to convert private ways to public ways. Transportation.
Title
Concerning the conversion of private ways to public ways
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-11 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4944 |
2022-01-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/10/2022 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H3409 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1607 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H4085 (Similar To) 2022-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4943
H143 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
H4944 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1607 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H4085 (Similar To) 2022-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4943
H143 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
H4944 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3439 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3439.pdf |