MA H3439 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2209
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-21 - Accompanied S2209
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-21 - Accompanied S2209
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the transportation of alcoholic beverages and property by agricultural, common or contract carriers. Transportation.
Title
Relative to carriers of property by motor vehicle
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-21 | Senate | Accompanied S2209 |
2023-09-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/02/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S2209 (Replaced by) 2023-12-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4659 (Similar To) 2024-05-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4659 (Similar To) 2024-05-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3439 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3439.pdf |