MA H3449 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4263
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to authorizing vintage grand prix auto racing in the city of Springfield. Transportation. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing Vintage Grand Prix Auto Racing in the City of Springfield
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-07-16 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4263 |
2012-05-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/12/2012 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-05-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-05-19 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H4263 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3449 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=16108&generalCourtId=1 |