MA H3461 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to providing for a MassPort airline regulation study. Transportation.
Title
Providing for a MassPort airline regulation study
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H2816 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Senate concurred
H2685 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4518
H3257 (Similar To) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H4457 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Senate concurred
H2685 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4518
H3257 (Similar To) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H4457 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3461 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3461.pdf |