MA H3466 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to designating a certain bridge in the town of Falmouth as the Deputy John Robert Kotfila, Jr. memorial bridge. Transportation.
Title
Designating a certain bridge in the town of Falmouth as the Deputy John Robert Kotfila Jr. memorial bridge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-29 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2024-01-25 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2023-12-28 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2023-12-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-12-28 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2023-12-18 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2023-08-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 08/29/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H2680 (Similar To) 2024-06-20 - Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 31, 2024, pending concurrence
S541 (Similar To) 2024-03-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3749 (Similar To) 2024-06-20 - Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 31, 2024, pending concurrence
H4044 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2024
H4827 (Similar To) 2024-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5045
S541 (Similar To) 2024-03-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3749 (Similar To) 2024-06-20 - Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 31, 2024, pending concurrence
H4044 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2024
H4827 (Similar To) 2024-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5045
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3466 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3466.pdf |