MA H3494 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-11-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 128 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-11-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 128 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the sale of alcoholic beverages in the town of Harvard By Ms. Benson of Lunenburg, a petition of Jennifer E. Benson and James B. Eldridge (by vote of the town) that the town of Harvard be authorized to issue licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages in said town. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the sale of alcoholic beverages in the town of Harvard
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-07 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 128 of the Acts of 2013 | |
2013-10-28 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2013-10-28 | House | Enacted |
2013-10-24 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2013-10-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Read second, amended, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2013-10-07 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2013-10-03 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2013-08-26 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2013-08-26 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-08-26 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2013-08-08 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2013-07-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2013 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-06-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3494 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3494.pdf |