MA H3495 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4639
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the recovery of legal fees incurred by municipalities on property in foreclosure. Revenue.
Title
Relative to tax title expense
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Ashe [D] | Rep. Bradley Jones [R] | Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D] | Sen. Anne Gobi [D] |
Rep. Elizabeth Poirier [R] | Sen. Richard Ross [R] | Rep. Shawn Dooley [R] | Rep. Chris Walsh [D] |
Sen. Michael Moore [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4639 |
2016-02-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/23/2016 from 01:30 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H4639 (Replaced by) 2016-09-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H778 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H536 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H2709 (Similar To) 2016-02-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H305 (Similar To) 2016-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H2710 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H778 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H536 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H2709 (Similar To) 2016-02-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H305 (Similar To) 2016-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H2710 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3495 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3495.pdf |