MA H3501 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5090
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5090
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5090
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the health impacts and costs of emissions associated with grid electricity and delivered fuels, and the benefits of energy conservation, energy efficiency and renewable energy. Public Health.
Title
Relative to protecting public health and reducing health care costs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-04 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5090 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-03 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday April 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-07-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S543 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S559 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S687 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S607 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H2917 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1151 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H5090 (Replaced by) 2020-11-04 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S559 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S687 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S607 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H2917 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1151 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H5090 (Replaced by) 2020-11-04 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3501 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3501.pdf |