MA H3510 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 52 of the Acts of 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 52 of the Acts of 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mr. Dempsey of Haverhill, for the committee on Ways and Means, on House, No. 3493, reported, in part, a Bill making appropriations for the fiscal year 2011 to provide for supplementing certain existing appropriations and for certain other activities and projects (House, No. 3510).
Title
Making appropriations for the Fiscal Year 2011 to provide for supplementing certain existing appropriations and for certain other activities and projects
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 52 of the Acts of 2011 |
2011-06-20 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2011-06-20 | House | Enacted |
2011-06-20 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2011-06-20 | House | Emergency preamble |
2011-06-20 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2011-06-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-06-16 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed (see Roll Call No. 42 Yeas 35 - Nays 0) |
2011-06-16 | Senate | Read third |
2011-06-16 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2011-06-16 | Senate | Amendment rejected |
2011-06-16 | Senate | Amendment rejected |
2011-06-16 | Senate | Amendment rejected |
2011-06-16 | Senate | Amendment rejected |
2011-06-16 | Senate | Amendment rejected |
2011-06-16 | Senate | Ways and Means amendment adopted |
2011-06-16 | Senate | Read second |
2011-06-16 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2011-06-16 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment |
2011-06-16 | Senate | Read and referred to committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2011-06-15 | House | Passed to be engrossed - 152 YEAS to 1 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 82) |
2011-06-15 | House | Amendment 3 rejected - 32 YEAS to 123 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 81) |
2011-06-15 | House | Amendment 2 rejected - 32 YEAS to 124 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 80) |
2011-06-15 | House | Amendment 1 adopted |
2011-06-15 | House | Read third |
2011-06-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-06-15 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2011-06-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-06-15 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2011-06-15 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2011-06-15 | House | Reported on a part of H3493 |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3510 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17036&generalCourtId=1 |