MA H3512 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4639
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize cities and towns to implement a system for the partial payment of property taxes and the charging of interest only on the unpaid balance. Revenue.
Title
Allowing for the partial payment of property taxes
Sponsors
Rep. Paul McMurtry [D] | Rep. Brian Ashe [D] | Rep. Fred Barrows [R] | Rep. Marjorie Decker [D] |
Rep. Louis Kafka [D] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Rep. Angelo Scaccia [D] | Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
Rep. Chris Walsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4639 |
2016-02-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/23/2016 from 01:30 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H4639 (Replaced by) 2016-09-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3512 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3512.pdf |