MA H3513 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4966
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize motorcyclists to travel in the breakdown lanes during periods of heavy traffic. Transportation.
Title
Relative to certain motorcycle travel
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-08 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4966 |
2022-01-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/19/2022 from 03:00 PM-06:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H3455 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied H3496
S1575 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2768
S2315 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
H3423 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4944
H3493 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2319 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
S2363 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2094 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681
H5095 (Similar To) 2022-08-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 185 of the Acts of 2022
H4966 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3589 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
H3441 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
S1575 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2768
S2315 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
H3423 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4944
H3493 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2319 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
S2363 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2094 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681
H5095 (Similar To) 2022-08-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 185 of the Acts of 2022
H4966 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3589 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
H3441 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3513 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3513.pdf |