MA H3517 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 319 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 319 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bill Title: An Act exempting the position of deputy police chief in the town of Dedham from the civil service law By Representative McMurtry of Dedham and Senator Rush, a joint petition of Paul McMurtry and Michael F. Rush (by vote of the town) that the town of Dedham be authorized to exempt the position of deputy police chief in said town from the civil service law. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Exempting the position of deputy police chief in the town of Dedham from the civil service law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-11 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 319 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2014-09-08 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-09-02 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-09-02 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-06-19 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-06-05 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-06-02 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2014-05-22 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-04-03 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday, June 30, 2014, pending concurrence |
2014-02-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2013 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-06-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Public Service |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3517 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3517.pdf |