MA H3523 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4941
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4941
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4941
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to encourage transportation network company pre-arranged shared rides. Transportation.
Title
To reduce congestion and encourage shared rides
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Livingstone [D] | Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D] | Rep. Kate Lipper-Garabedian [D] | Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D] |
Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Rep. Natalie Higgins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4941 |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-06-06 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday July 1, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-05-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 3, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday April 29, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-01-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/18/2022 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S2295 (Similar To) 2022-07-06 - House concurred
S2436 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H1161 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5235
S2267 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2753
S2753 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4941 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2436 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H1161 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5235
S2267 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2753
S2753 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4941 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3523 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3523.pdf |