MA H3523 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3491
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Accompanied H3491
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Accompanied H3491
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to increase the annuity for disabled veterans and their families. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
To increase the annuity for disabled veterans and their families
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-06 | House | Accompanied H3491 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-11-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/13/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H2854 (Similar To) 2024-06-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4720
S2344 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2651
H3509 (Similar To) 2024-05-06 - Accompanied H3491
H1071 (Similar To) 2024-06-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H4705
S2322 (Similar To) 2024-05-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3491 (Replaced by) 2024-05-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2344 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2651
H3509 (Similar To) 2024-05-06 - Accompanied H3491
H1071 (Similar To) 2024-06-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H4705
S2322 (Similar To) 2024-05-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3491 (Replaced by) 2024-05-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3523 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3523.pdf |