MA H3524 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4966
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to repeal the requirement for operators and passengers on motorcycles over the age of eighteen to wear protective headgear. Transportation.
Title
Relative to motorcycle helmet choice
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-08 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4966 |
2022-01-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/19/2022 from 03:00 PM-06:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H3536 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
H3485 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
H3487 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2329 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2331 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2333 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2354 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
H4966 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3485 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
H3487 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2329 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2331 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2333 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2354 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
H4966 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3524 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3524.pdf |