MA H3527 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5042
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to siting of marijuana establishments. Cannabis Policy.
Title
Relative to siting a marijuana establishment
Sponsors
Rep. Hannah Kane [R] | Rep. Donald Berthiaume [R] | Rep. David DeCoste [R] | Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R] |
Rep. Randy Hunt [R] | Rep. Joseph McKenna [R] | Rep. Alyson Sullivan-Almeida [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5042 |
2019-09-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Cannabis Policy |
Same As/Similar To
S1985 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S2000 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S2001 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H784 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1832 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Reporting date extended to Friday June 5, 2020, pending concurrence
H5042 (Replaced by) 2020-10-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2000 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S2001 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H784 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1832 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Reporting date extended to Friday June 5, 2020, pending concurrence
H5042 (Replaced by) 2020-10-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3527 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3527.pdf |