MA H3531 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the use of certain trailers by farmers. Transportation.
Title
Relative to pup trailers
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Mark [D] | Rep. Steven Howitt [R] | Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] | Rep. David DeCoste [R] |
Rep. Susan Gifford [R] | Rep. Paul McMurtry [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-03-29 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2022-02-22 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-01-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/18/2022 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H3409 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1004 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
H1007 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2880
H3060 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S1063 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1702
S198 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S540 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S209 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2674
H1004 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
H1007 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2880
H3060 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S1063 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1702
S198 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S540 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S209 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2674
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3531 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3531.pdf |