MA H3543 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4245
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4245
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4245
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a portion of Route 62 in the towns of Hudson, Berlin, Clinton, Sterling and Princeton as a cultural highway. Transportation.
Title
Establishing a cultural highway
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-05 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4245 |
2015-12-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/06/2016 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H4245 (Replaced by) 2017-01-03 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H1512 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1513 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H3051 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H2640 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4213
H2161 (Similar To) 2016-01-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1512 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1513 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H3051 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H2640 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4213
H2161 (Similar To) 2016-01-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3543 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3543.pdf |