MA H3556 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2306
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Rogers of Cambridge, a petition of David M. Rogers and others that the Department of Elementary and Secondary Education be authorized to developing best practices and recommendations for instruction in digital citizenship, internet safety, and media literacy. Education.
Title
Relating to digital citizenship and media literacy in public schools
Sponsors
Rep. David Rogers [D] | Rep. Denise Provost [D] | Sen. Jason Lewis [D] | Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D] |
Sen. Diana DiZoglio [D] | Rep. Mike Connolly [D] | Rep. Jeffrey Roy [D] | Rep. David Vieira [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2306 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-02-07 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday February 14, 2018, pending concurrence |
2017-06-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H2868 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3554 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4685
H239 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4716
H256 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4685
S1997 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
H1920 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4376
S329 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2424
H2845 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
H314 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
H2024 (Similar To) 2018-06-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4641
H325 (Similar To) 2018-01-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4130
S2306 (Replaced by) 2018-03-22 - New draft substituted, see S2355
S2367 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3554 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4685
H239 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4716
H256 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4685
S1997 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
H1920 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4376
S329 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2424
H2845 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
H314 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
H2024 (Similar To) 2018-06-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4641
H325 (Similar To) 2018-01-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4130
S2306 (Replaced by) 2018-03-22 - New draft substituted, see S2355
S2367 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3556 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3556.pdf |