MA H3582 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 114 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 114 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to clarify the executive powers of the water and sewer commission of the town of Foxborough. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
To clarify the executive powers of the Board of Water and Sewer Commissioners in the town of Foxborough
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-24 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 114 of the Acts of 2016 | |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2016-05-16 | House | Enacted |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2016-01-14 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2015-07-29 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2015-07-29 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-07-29 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2015-07-23 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-07-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-06-15 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H69 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H2447 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H307 (Similar To) 2016-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H2446 (Similar To) 2015-05-07 - Accompanied H2517
H539 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H2447 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H307 (Similar To) 2016-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H2446 (Similar To) 2015-05-07 - Accompanied H2517
H539 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3582 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3582.pdf |