MA H3585 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4442
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4442
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4442
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to bow hunting. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to bow hunting
Sponsors
Rep. Tackey Chan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-17 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4442 |
2012-01-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2011 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in 437 |
2011-07-14 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-06-16 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the House Committee on Environment Natural Resources and Agriculture |
2011-04-19 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4442 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3585 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=15076&generalCourtId=1 |