MA H3587 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4216
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4216
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4216
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Provincetown be authorized to increase exemptions for residential properties in said town. Revenue. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Increasing the exemption for residential property in the town of Provincetown
Sponsors
Rep. Sarah Peake [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-14 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4216 |
2016-02-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/23/2016 from 01:30 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-06-15 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H4216 (Replaced by) 2016-08-11 - Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H3299 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H3300 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2648 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2031 (Similar To) 2016-07-08 - Senate concurred
H2030 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H3299 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H3300 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2648 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2031 (Similar To) 2016-07-08 - Senate concurred
H2030 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3587 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3587.pdf |