MA H3588 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 26 of the Acts of 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 26 of the Acts of 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Unpaid municipal fines
Title
Relative to unpaid municipal fines.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-10 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 26 of the Acts of 2010 | |
2010-02-01 | Enacted | |
2010-02-01 | Enacted and laid before the Governor | |
2010-01-28 | House concurred in the Senate amendment | |
2010-01-28 | Rules suspended | |
2010-01-28 | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on Ethics and Rules), ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed | |
2010-01-28 | Taken out of the Orders of the Day | |
2010-01-21 | Placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session with the amendment pending | |
2010-01-21 | Motion to suspend rules negatived | |
2010-01-21 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session, with an amendment | |
2010-01-19 | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Committee On Ethics and Rules | |
2010-01-14 | Passed to be engrossed 143 YEAS to 1 NAYS (See Yea and Nay in Supplement, | |
2010-01-14 | Amendment adopted | |
2010-01-14 | Read third | |
2010-01-14 | Rules suspended | |
2009-06-11 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | |
2009-06-08 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading | |
2009-06-01 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Committee On Steering, Policy and Scheduling | |
2009-01-20 | Senate concurred | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to the committee on Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/186/House/H3588 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=2630&generalCourtId=2 |