MA H3591 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on November 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-11-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 339 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on November 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-11-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 339 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to voting on the approval of funding collective bargaining agreements in the town of North Andover
Title
Relative to the approval of funding at town meeting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-29 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 339 of the Acts of 2012 | |
2012-11-21 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-11-21 | House | Enacted |
2012-11-19 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-11-19 | Senate | Taken out of the orders of the day |
2012-08-02 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2012-07-25 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2011-10-13 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2011-10-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-10-13 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2011-09-22 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2011-09-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/14/2011 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-07-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-07-18 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3591 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17111&generalCourtId=1 |