MA H3597 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to education funding for charter schools. Education.
Title
Relative to education funding for charter schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-06-20 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-06-18 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2012-06-05 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2011-10-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2011 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3597 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=12244&generalCourtId=1 |