MA H3597 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3714
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-08-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3714
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-08-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3714
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of North Andover be authorized to issue an additional license for the sale all alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premise. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of North Andover to grant an additional liquor license
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-06 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3714 |
2015-07-24 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 07/28/2015 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in 437 |
2015-07-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/28/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 437 |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-06-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H3714 (Replaced by) 2016-09-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 256 of the Acts of 2016
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3597 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3597.pdf |