MA H3598 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4570
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4570
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4570
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representative Montaño of Boston, a petition of Samantha Montaño that the Department of Housing and Community Development establish a pilot program to demonstrate the individual, family, and community economic impacts and state-level cost savings of a universal basic income. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to universal basic income
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-15 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4570 |
2023-10-30 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 11/14/2023 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in B-2 |
2023-10-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2023 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in B-2 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-03-30 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S86 (Similar To) 2024-03-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2581 (Similar To) 2024-07-30 - Senate concurred
H1312 (Similar To) 2024-08-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4570 (Replaced by) 2024-05-15 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2581 (Similar To) 2024-07-30 - Senate concurred
H1312 (Similar To) 2024-08-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4570 (Replaced by) 2024-05-15 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3598 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3598.pdf |