MA H3599 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish an office of maritime planning and policy development. Transportation.
Title
To establish an office of maritime planning and policy development
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2021-09-02 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-07-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/28/2021 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H276 (Similar To) 2022-03-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4463
H211 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5287
H211 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5287
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3599 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3599.pdf |