MA H3615 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4739
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4739
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4739
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the definition of health care adverse outcome disclosure, apology and early offer programs. Public Health.
Title
Relative to the definition of disclosure, apology and early offer programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4739 |
2023-09-18 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 09/21/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-09-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/21/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-03-30 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H4353 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4543 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4739 (Replaced by) 2024-07-01 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H5038 (Similar To) 2024-09-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H4543 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4739 (Replaced by) 2024-07-01 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H5038 (Similar To) 2024-09-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3615 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3615.pdf |