MA H3627 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 51 of the Acts of 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 51 of the Acts of 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the Commonwealth Avenue Improvement Project. Transportation.
Title
Authorizing the city of Boston to acquire temporary easements over certain parcels of land in the town of Brookline
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Honan [D] | Rep. Michael Moran [D] | Rep. Frank Smizik [D] | Sen. William Brownsberger [D] |
Sen. Cynthia Creem [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-04 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 51 of the Acts of 2015 | |
2015-07-30 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2015-07-30 | House | Enacted |
2015-07-30 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (titled changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2015-07-30 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-07-30 | Senate | Committee recommended that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2015-07-27 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2015-07-23 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2015-07-13 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2015-07-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-07-13 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2015-07-09 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-06-24 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules, reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H2758 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H404 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4145
H999 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4622
H1107 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4140
H1844 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H404 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4145
H999 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4622
H1107 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4140
H1844 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3627 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3627.pdf |