MA H3637 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 138 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 138 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bill Title: An Act exempting Martin B. Parayno from the maximum age requirement for firefighters in the city of Methuen By Ms. DiZoglio of Methuen, a petition of Diana DiZoglio and others (with the approval of the mayor and city council) that the city of Methuen be authorized to appoint Martin B. Parayno a firefighter in said city notwithstanding the maximum age requirement. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Exempting Martin B. Parayno from the maximum age requirement for firefighters in the city of Methuen
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-17 | Senate | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 138 of the Acts of 2014 |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-06-10 | House | Enacted |
2014-06-09 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2014-05-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-03-27 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2014-03-12 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-10 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2014-03-10 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-02-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/07/2014 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-08-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-08-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Public Service |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3637 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3637.pdf |