MA H3637 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 215 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 215 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to designate a certain bridge in the city of Boston the Honorable Arthur J. Lewis, Jr. bridge. Transportation.
Title
Designating a certain bridge in the city of Boston as The Honorable Arthur J. Lewis, Jr. Bridge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-09 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 215 of the Acts of 2016 | |
2016-07-30 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2016-07-30 | House | Enacted |
2016-07-30 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2016-07-30 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-03-24 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2015-08-03 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2015-08-03 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-08-03 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2015-07-29 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-07-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2015 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-06-25 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
2015-06-18 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3637 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3637.pdf |