MA H3642 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 37 of the Acts of 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 37 of the Acts of 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the membership of the conservation commission of the town of Holliston. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the membership of the conservation commission of the town of Holliston
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-26 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 37 of the Acts of 2019 | |
2019-07-16 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2019-07-16 | House | Enacted |
2019-07-15 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2019-07-15 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-06-06 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2019-05-15 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-05-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-05-15 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2019-05-08 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-04-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S1187 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2524
H775 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5073
H4048 (Similar To) 2019-10-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4118
H775 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5073
H4048 (Similar To) 2019-10-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4118
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3642 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3642.pdf |