MA H3643 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4263
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Sullivan of Fall River, a petition (subject to Joint Rule 12) of David B. Sullivan, Michael J. Rodrigues and another (with the approval of the mayor and city council) that the city of Fall River be authorized to take control of a portion of Davol street in said city. Transportation. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to Davol Street, City of Fall River
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-07-16 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4263 |
2011-11-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/30/2011 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-07-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-06-13 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules, reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the House Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H4263 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3643 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=16976&generalCourtId=1 |