MA H3647 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S313
Note: Legislation replaced by H3772
Note: Legislation replaced by H3772
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on September 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-20 - New draft substituted, see H3772
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-20 - New draft substituted, see H3772
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to election laws
Title
Relative to election laws
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-20 | House | New draft substituted, see H3772 |
2013-11-20 | House | Read second, amendment adopted (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) |
2013-11-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-11-20 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting with the amendment previously recommended pending |
2013-11-20 | House | Referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment previously recommended pending |
2013-11-20 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H3772 |
2013-11-13 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2013-09-16 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2013-09-16 | House | New draft of S313, S327, H609, H610, H611 and H615 |
2013-09-16 | House | Reported from the committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
S313 (Replaces) 2013-09-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3647
H3772 (Replaced by) 2013-11-27 - Published as amended, see H3788
H3772 (Replaced by) 2013-11-27 - Published as amended, see H3788
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3647 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3647.pdf |