MA H3657 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3737
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 79 of the Acts of 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 79 of the Acts of 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Jeremy Bray, an employee of the Department of Correction. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Jeremy Bray, an employee of the Department of Correction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-10 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 79 of the Acts of 2015 | |
2015-09-03 | Senate | Re-enacted and again laid before the Governor |
2015-09-03 | House | Re-enacted |
2015-09-03 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2015-08-31 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2015-08-27 | Senate | Governor's amendment adopted |
2015-08-27 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-08-24 | House | Governor's amendment adopted (in the form approved by the committee on Bills in the Third Reading) |
2015-08-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2015-08-20 | House | For message, see H3737 |
2015-08-18 | Governor returned to the House with recommendation of amendment | |
2015-08-10 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2015-08-10 | House | Enacted |
2015-08-10 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2015-08-10 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2015-08-06 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2015-08-06 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-08-06 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2015-07-30 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2015-07-29 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2015-07-27 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2015-07-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-07-27 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2015-07-23 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-07-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-07-08 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2015-07-07 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H3737 (Replaced by) 2015-08-20 - See H3657
H4730 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 422 of the Acts of 2016
H122 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H123 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H259 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H1565 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H4730 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 422 of the Acts of 2016
H122 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H123 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H259 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H1565 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3657 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3657.pdf |