MA H3669 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H3319
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on May 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying eligibility for the earned income tax credit
Title
Clarifying eligibility for the earned income tax credit
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2017-05-04 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2017-05-04 | House | New draft of H3319 |
2017-05-04 | House | Reported from the committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H3319 (Replaces) 2017-05-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3669
S1384 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S648 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
H1504 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3852
S51 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3558 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H33 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S1384 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S648 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
H1504 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3852
S51 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3558 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H33 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3669 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3669.pdf |