MA H3677 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to COLA adjustments for veteran benefits. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
Relative to COLA adjustments for veteran benefits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-03-28 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-09-13 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 09/24/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-09-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/16/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S2408 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2455 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
S1720 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H2883 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4111 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H19
H1221 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5167
S2112 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1773 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H2611 (Similar To) 2022-07-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5020
H2553 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1690 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S927 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S84 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S96 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S967 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S631 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S2425 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3640 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S906 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S2420 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2455 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
S1720 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H2883 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4111 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H19
H1221 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5167
S2112 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1773 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H2611 (Similar To) 2022-07-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5020
H2553 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1690 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S927 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S84 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S96 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S967 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S631 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S2425 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3640 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S906 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S2420 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3677 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3677.pdf |