MA H3678 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4189
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on October 2 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4189
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 2 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4189
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bill Title: An Act providing the retirement board of the City of Cambridge to grant creditable service to Kenneth T. Mui, Andrew Topouzoglou, Steven DeMarco, and Anthony Cacciola By Mr. Toomey of Cambridge, a petition of Timothy J. Toomey, Jr. and others (with the approval of the mayor and city council) that the retirement board of the city of Cambridge be authorized to grant certain creditable services allowances. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Providing the retirement board of the City of Cambridge to grant creditable service to Kenneth T. Mui, Andrew Topouzoglou, Steven DeMarco, and Anthony Cacciola
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Toomey [D] | Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D] | Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D] | Rep. Jay Livingstone [D] |
Rep. Marjorie Decker [D] | Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D] | Rep. David Rogers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-23 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4189 |
2014-02-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/07/2014 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-10-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-10-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H4189 (Replaced by) 2014-11-20 - Reported, in part, by H3638
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3678 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3678.pdf |