MA H3679 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the position of appointed treasurer-collector in the town of Hinsdale. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the position of appointed treasurer-collector in the Town if Hinsdale
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Mark [D] | Sen. Adam Hinds [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2020 | |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2020-01-09 | House | Enacted |
2020-01-06 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2019-12-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2019-10-03 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-07-30 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2019-07-29 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2019-07-10 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-07-10 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-07-10 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2019-07-09 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-04-04 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3679 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3679.pdf |