MA H3685 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 170 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 170 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the membership of the Northampton Housing Authority. Housing. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the Northampton Housing Authority
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-03 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 170 of the Acts of 2020 | |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2020-08-27 | House | Enacted |
2020-08-24 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2020-08-24 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2020-07-11 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2020-06-15 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2020-02-13 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-13 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2020-02-03 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-05-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2019 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-04-08 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
H2937 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H2784 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S410 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S1551 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2247 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S2253 (Similar To) 2019-10-15 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2363 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2784 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S410 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S1551 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2247 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S2253 (Similar To) 2019-10-15 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2363 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3685 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3685.pdf |