MA H3697 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4215
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4215
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4215
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to property tax exemptions for surviving parents of certain deceased members of the armed forces. Revenue.
Title
Regarding surviving military parents
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4215 |
2017-09-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-05-10 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
2017-05-01 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H3693 (Similar To) 2017-11-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4004
S1500 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1492 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H1466 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S1619 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H3310 (Similar To) 2017-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3906
S2160 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - New draft substituted, see S2364
H4215 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1500 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1492 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H1466 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S1619 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H3310 (Similar To) 2017-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3906
S2160 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - New draft substituted, see S2364
H4215 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3697 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3697.pdf |