MA H3702 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 10 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-10 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 10 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-10 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
(by vote of the town) that the town of Becket be authorized to establish the Sherwood Forest Lake District
Title
(by vote of the town) that the town of Becket be authorized to establish the Sherwood Forest Lake District
Sponsors
Rep. Denis Guyer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-10 | Enacted and laid before the Governor | |
2010-05-06 | Enacted | |
2010-05-03 | Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed | |
2009-11-17 | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed | |
2009-11-17 | Rules suspended | |
2009-07-29 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | |
2009-07-28 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading | |
2009-07-27 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House Committee On Steering, Policy and Scheduling | |
2009-01-20 | Public Hearing date 6/16 at 10:00 AM in Hearing Room B-1 | |
2009-01-20 | Senate concurred | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.mass.gov/legis/186history/h03702.htm |
Text | http://www.mass.gov/legis/bills/house/186/ht03/ht03702.htm |