MA H3704 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H1002
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 157 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 157 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to enhancing access to services for mental health treatment
Title
Relative to enhancing access to services for mental health treatment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-02 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 157 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-06-23 | House | Enacted |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #367 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0] |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Read third |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2014-02-18 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2013-11-20 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2013-11-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-11-04 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2013-10-17 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2013-10-17 | House | New draft of H1002 |
2013-10-17 | House | Reported from the committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
H1002 (Replaces) 2013-10-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3704
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3704 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3704.pdf |