MA H3705 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4527
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4527
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4527
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to data collection for the research agenda of the Cannabis Control Commission. Cannabis Policy.
Title
Relative to research data collection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4527 |
2019-12-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/17/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-05-06 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Cannabis Policy |
Same As/Similar To
H350 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H4527 (Replaced by) 2020-03-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4527 (Replaced by) 2020-03-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3705 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3705.pdf |