MA H3713 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H3549
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 104 of the Acts of 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 104 of the Acts of 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
.
Title
Authorizing the city of Melrose to grant licenses for the sale of alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-22 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 104 of the Acts of 2015 | |
2015-10-13 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2015-10-13 | House | Enacted |
2015-10-08 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2015-10-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2015-10-01 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed |
2015-10-01 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Lewis) adopted |
2015-10-01 | Senate | Read third |
2015-10-01 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2015-09-24 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2015-09-03 | House | Read third (title changed), amended and passed to be engrossed |
2015-08-10 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2015-08-10 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-08-10 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2015-08-06 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-08-06 | House | New draft of H3549 |
2015-08-06 | House | Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H3549 (Replaces) 2015-08-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3713
H3368 (Similar To) 2015-07-27 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3691
H3369 (Similar To) 2015-10-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 106 of the Acts of 2015
H3370 (Similar To) 2015-06-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 43 of the Acts of 2015
H3371 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 67 of the Acts of 2016
H3372 (Similar To) 2016-02-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 33 of the Acts of 2016
H3368 (Similar To) 2015-07-27 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3691
H3369 (Similar To) 2015-10-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 106 of the Acts of 2015
H3370 (Similar To) 2015-06-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 43 of the Acts of 2015
H3371 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 67 of the Acts of 2016
H3372 (Similar To) 2016-02-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 33 of the Acts of 2016
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3713 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3713.pdf |